WI AB744 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend subchapter II (title) of chapter 50 [precedes 50.20], 50.33 (title) and 257.01 (8); and to create 50.20, 50.22, 50.36 (7), 146.997 (1) (d) 13m., 252.14 (1) (ar) 16. and 257.01 (12) of the statutes; relating to: qualification requirements for performing surgical technology for a hospital or ambulatory surgery center.
Title
Qualification requirements for performing surgical technology for a hospital or ambulatory surgery center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-29 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-29 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-16 | LRB correction | |
2010-03-16 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Pasch | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab744 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB744.pdf |