WI AB747 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 813.12 (3) (a) (intro.), 813.12 (4) (a) (intro.), 813.122 (4) (a) (intro.), 813.122 (5) (a) (intro.), 813.125 (3) (a) (intro.), 813.125 (4) (a) (intro.), 951.01 (2), 951.13 (intro.), 951.13 (2), 951.15, 951.18 (1) and 951.18 (4) (c); and to create 948.057, 951.18 (1m), 951.18 (1r) and 951.18 (4) (d) of the statutes; relating to: crimes against animals and providing a penalty.
Title
Crimes against animals and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 50, Noes 47 | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:38 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-04-13 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Milroy | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-06 | Report without recommendation by committee on Criminal Justice (Assembly Rule 19) | |
2010-04-06 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-26 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Milroy | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab747 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB747.pdf |