WI AB75 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.566 (1) (hp); and to create 20.255 (3) (ge) and 71.10 (5k) of the statutes; relating to: creating an individual income tax checkoff for the Special Olympics Wisconsin, Inc., and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating an individual income tax checkoff for the Special Olympics Wisconsin, Inc., and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-11-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2011-10-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-09-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means |
2011-04-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab75 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB75.pdf |