WI AB759 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g) and 71.45 (2) (a) 10.; and to create 71.07 (8m), 71.10 (4) (ha), 71.28 (8m), 71.30 (3) (cu), 71.47 (8m), 71.49 (1) (cu) and 101.129 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring universal changing stations in certain buildings and creating a tax credit for installation of the stations. (FE)
Title
Requiring universal changing stations in certain buildings and creating a tax credit for installation of the stations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab759 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB759.pdf |