WI AB78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 340.01 (32) (a) (intro.); to renumber 340.01 (32) (a) 1., 340.01 (32) (a) 2. and 340.01 (32) (b); to renumber and amend 990.01 (43m); to amend 20.395 (5) (dr), 20.395 (5) (eh), 85.30, 340.01 (29m) (am) 2., 340.01 (32) (intro.), 340.01 (38m) (a) 1., 341.10 (6), 343.03 (3) (a), 343.04 (1) (e), 343.05 (3) (b), 343.07 (1g) (intro.), 343.07 (4) (title) and (a), 343.07 (4) (b), 343.08 (1) (a), 343.08 (2) (a), 343.16 (1) (d) 1., 343.16 (2) (b), 343.17 (3) (c) 5., 343.32 (4), 346.54 (1) (cm), 346.595 (1), 346.595 (3), 346.595 (3m), 347.09 (1) (b), 347.15 (1), 347.35 (1a), 347.42, 347.485 (title) and (1), 347.485 (2) (c), 347.485 (3), 347.485 (4), 347.486 (1), 347.486 (2), 347.487 and 990.01 (43r); and to create 340.01 (3m) and 341.25 (1) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: registration and operation of vehicles defined as autocycles. (FE)
Title
Registration and operation of vehicles defined as autocycles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-11-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-11-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-10-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-24 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2019-09-19 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2019-09-19 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2019-07-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2019-05-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2019-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab78 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB78.pdf |