WI AB780 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 45.01 (12) (k) of the statutes; Relating to: indication of veteran status of former service member on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)
Title
Indication of veteran status of former service member on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-12-08 | House | Introduced |