WI AB806 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 117.20 (1); to amend 117.22 (1) (b) 1.; and to create 117.08 (5) and 117.20 (1) (b) of the statutes; relating to: the procedure for school district consolidations.
Title
The procedure for school district consolidations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-15 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:44 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-31 | Report passage recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | |
2010-03-23 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-11 | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor | |
2010-03-09 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab806 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB806.pdf |