WI AB809 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: the sale and purchase of lands by the Natural Resources Board for the purpose of the completion of a recreational trail. (FE)
Title
The sale and purchase of lands by the Natural Resources Board for the purpose of the completion of a recreational trail. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:12 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab809 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB809.pdf |