WI AB818 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 704.90 (5) (b) 1. b., 704.90 (5) (b) 2. ag. and 704.90 (6) (a) 5. a.; to renumber 349.13 (3m) (a) 1. and 704.90 (7); to consolidate, renumber and amend 704.90 (6) (a) 5. (intro.) and b.; to amend 349.13 (3m) (d), 349.13 (3m) (dr) 2., 349.13 (5) (b) 2., 704.90 (1) (e), 704.90 (4b) (a), 704.90 (5) (a), 704.90 (5) (b) (intro.), 704.90 (5) (b) 1. (intro.), 704.90 (5) (b) 2. (intro.), 704.90 (5) (b) 2. d., 704.90 (6) (a) 2., 704.90 (6) (a) 4., 704.90 (6) (a) 6., 704.90 (6) (a) 7. (intro.), 704.90 (6) (a) 7. c., 704.90 (6) (a) 8., 704.90 (6) (b) and 704.90 (7) (title); and to create 349.13 (3m) (a) 1g., 1n., 1r. and 3., 349.13 (3m) (bm), 628.02 (1) (b) 10., 632.976, 704.90 (1) (i), 704.90 (1) (j), 704.90 (5) (c), 704.90 (5r), 704.90 (6) (am) and 704.90 (7) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: enforcing liens on personal property stored in self-service storage facilities and units, towing a vehicle of a lessee in default, authorizing the sale of self-service storage limited lines insurance, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Enforcing liens on personal property stored in self-service storage facilities and units, towing a vehicle of a lessee in default, authorizing the sale of self-service storage limited lines insurance, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Barca [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. Debra Kolste [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] | Sen. Robert Wirch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab818 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB818.pdf |