WI AB864 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 125.07 (1) (b) 6.; and to create 125.07 (1) (b) 6. a. and c. of the statutes; Relating to: alcohol beverages violations involving underage persons that occur on licensed premises.
Title
Alcohol beverages violations involving underage persons that occur on licensed premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] | Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 339 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Local Government |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:07 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced |