WI AB867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 283.31 (8); and to create 20.285 (1) (ib), 20.370 (4) (ca), 20.370 (4) (cb), 20.435 (1) (d), 20.435 (1) (r), 280.11 (3), 281.16 (3) (em), 281.16 (3) (f) and 283.31 (5d) of the statutes; Relating to: groundwater monitoring, CAFO fees, nutrient management plans, well construction rules, the SnapPlus program, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Groundwater monitoring, CAFO fees, nutrient management plans, well construction rules, the SnapPlus program, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab867 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB867.pdf |