WI AB873 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (13) (br); to renumber 30.80 (6) (c); to renumber and amend 23.33 (1) (jm), 23.33 (13) (b) 4., 23.33 (13) (d), 23.335 (1) (zf), 23.335 (23) (c) 4., 23.335 (23) (g), 30.50 (9x), 350.01 (10r) and 350.11 (3) (c); to amend 23.33 (4c) (a) 3., 23.33 (4c) (a) 4., 23.33 (4c) (b) 3., 23.33 (4t), 23.33 (13) (b) 1., 23.33 (13) (b) 2., 23.33 (13) (b) 3., 23.33 (13) (bg), 23.33 (13) (cm), 23.33 (13) (dm), 23.335 (12) (a) 3., 23.335 (12) (a) 4., 23.335 (12) (b) 3., 23.335 (12) (j), 23.335 (23) (c) 1., 23.335 (23) (c) 2., 23.335 (23) (c) 3., 23.335 (23) (h), 30.681 (1) (bn), 30.681 (1) (c), 30.681 (2) (c), 30.681 (2) (d) 1. a., 30.686, 30.74 (1) (bn), 30.80 (6) (a) 1., 30.80 (6) (a) 2., 30.80 (6) (a) 3., 30.80 (6) (a) 4., 30.80 (6) (a) 5., 30.80 (6) (a) 6., 30.80 (6) (e), 59.54 (14) (g), 343.10 (1) (a), 343.10 (2) (a) 1., 343.10 (9), 343.21 (1) (jr), 350.101 (1) (d), 350.101 (2) (c), 350.106, 350.11 (3) (a) 1., 350.11 (3) (a) 2., 350.11 (3) (a) 3., 350.11 (3) (bm), 350.11 (3) (cm), 940.09 (1m) (b) and 940.25 (1m) (b); and to create 23.33 (1) (ib), 23.33 (1) (ih), 23.33 (1) (jd), 23.33 (1) (jh), 23.33 (1) (jk), 23.33 (4y), 23.33 (13) (b) 4b., 23.33 (13) (b) 5., 23.33 (13) (bm), 23.33 (13) (ce), 23.33 (13) (d) 2., 23.33 (13) (eg), 23.335 (1) (km), 23.335 (1) (nm), 23.335 (1) (zdr), 23.335 (1) (zer), 23.335 (1) (zet), 23.335 (12) (km), 23.335 (23) (c) 4b., 23.335 (23) (c) 5., 23.335 (23) (cg), 23.335 (23) (dm), 23.335 (23) (dr), 23.335 (23) (fm), 23.335 (23) (g) 2., 23.335 (23) (im), 30.50 (4n), 30.50 (4v), 30.50 (9m), 30.50 (9s), 30.50 (9t), 30.688, 30.80 (6) (am), 30.80 (6) (ar), 30.80 (6) (bg), 30.80 (6) (bn), 30.80 (6) (c) 2., 30.80 (6) (cm), 350.01 (9b), 350.01 (10p), 350.01 (10q), 350.1075, 350.11 (3) (a) 4b., 350.11 (3) (a) 5., 350.11 (3) (am), 350.11 (3) (ar), 350.11 (3) (bg), 350.11 (3) (c) 2. and 350.11 (3) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: intoxicated operation of all-terrain vehicles, utility terrain vehicles, off-highway motorcycles, snowmobiles, motorboats, and motor vehicles, snowmobile safety instruction for persons under 16 years of age, providing a penalty, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Intoxicated operation of all-terrain vehicles, utility terrain vehicles, off-highway motorcycles, snowmobiles, motorboats, and motor vehicles, snowmobile safety instruction for persons under 16 years of age, providing a penalty, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D] |
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Jacque and Horlacher |
2018-02-14 | House | Department of Transportation Revocation report received pursuant to s.13.0965, Wisconsin Statutes |
2018-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab873 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB873.pdf |