WI AB878 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 196.745 (2) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the penalties for gas pipeline safety violations and providing a penalty.
Title
Increasing the penalties for gas pipeline safety violations and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Summerfield [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Sen. Julian Bradley [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-17 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-01-12 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2024-01-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2024-01-02 | House | Introduced |