WI AB879 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0602 (3) (dq), 66.0602 (3) (dv) and 66.1105 (4m) (b) 2m.; and to amend 66.0602 (1) (d), 66.0602 (3) (dm), 66.0602 (3) (ds) and 66.1105 (6m) (c) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: local levy increase limit calculations related to tax incremental districts. (FE)
Title
Local levy increase limit calculations related to tax incremental districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2024-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-01-02 | House | Introduced |