WI AB89 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 340.01 (22e); and to create 340.01 (22e) (a) 3. and 340.01 (22e) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for certain traffic violations where highway maintenance workers are present and providing a penalty.
Title
Penalties for certain traffic violations where highway maintenance workers are present and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-10 | House | LRB correction |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-06-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Summerfield added as a coauthor |
2023-06-13 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-06-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-29 | House | Senator James added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced |