WI AB93 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 254.92 (2m) (intro.) of the statutes; relating to: prohibiting purchase of tobacco products on behalf of, or to provide to, a minor and providing penalties.
Title
Prohibiting purchase of tobacco products on behalf of, or to provide to, a minor and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | House | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 249 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-02-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-02-15 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-25 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-10-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-25 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-25 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld |
2011-10-25 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2011-10-25 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane pursuant to Assembly Rule 54 not well taken |
2011-10-25 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-20 | House | Placed on calendar 10-25-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Public Health and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2011-10-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Public Health and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2011-10-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-10-03 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies |
2011-09-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health and Public Safety |
2011-04-13 | House | Introduced |