WI AB954 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 448.05 (2) (a) (intro.), 448.05 (2) (b) (intro.) and 448.974 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 448.01 (3), 448.02 (4m), 448.04 (1) (br), 448.05 (2m), 448.971 (5) and 448.974 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: provisional licenses to practice medicine and surgery for internationally trained physicians and physician assistants and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Provisional licenses to practice medicine and surgery for internationally trained physicians and physician assistants and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 214 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan |
2024-02-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan |
2024-01-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan |
2024-01-18 | House | Representative Green added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced |