WI AB96 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.39 (3) (b); and to create 961.39 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prescriptions for controlled substances issued by optometrists and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures.
Title
Prescriptions for controlled substances issued by optometrists and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 2 |
2015-06-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab96 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB96.pdf |