WI AJR1 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 8 (2) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: conditions for release prior to conviction, including the imposition of bail (second consideration).
Title
Conditions for release prior to conviction, including the imposition of bail (second consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-01-12 | House | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2023-01-12 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-01-11 | House | Representatives Brooks and Donovan added as coauthors |
2023-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-01-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-06 | House | Introduced |