WI AJR130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To renumber and amend section 1 of article I; and to create section 1 (2) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: the term persons (first consideration).
Title
The term persons (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Kurtz added as a coauthor |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr130 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR130.pdf |