WI AJR34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending Tony Bennett of the University of Virginia men's basketball team for winning the 2019 NCAA Division 1 National Championship.
Title
Commending Tony Bennett of the University of Virginia men's basketball team for winning the 2019 NCAA Division 1 National Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-05-10 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-05-09 | House | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-07 | House | Representatives Sargent and Tusler added as coauthors |
2019-05-06 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr34 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR34.pdf |