WI AJR63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: a statement in support of increased milk consumption among America's youth.
Title
A statement in support of increased milk consumption among America's youth.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] | Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Rep. Debra Kolste [D] |
Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Dave Considine [D] | Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senators Ringhand, Marklein and Smith added as cosponsors |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Senator Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2019-06-20 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr63 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR63.pdf |