WI AJR74 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: observing August 15, 2021, as India Day in Wisconsin.
Title
Observing August 15, 2021, as India Day in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-08-19 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-08-19 | House | Introduced |