WI SB1 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.06 (1q), 71.06 (1r) (a), 71.06 (1r) (b), 71.06 (1r) (c), 71.06 (2) (i), 71.06 (2) (j), 71.06 (2) (k), 71.06 (2) (km), 71.06 (2) (L), 71.06 (2) (Lm), 71.06 (2) (m), 71.06 (2) (mm), 71.06 (2e) (be), 71.06 (2e) (bm), 71.06 (2e) (bs), 71.06 (2s) (e), 71.06 (2s) (f), 71.06 (2s) (g) and 73.03 (71); to renumber 71.06 (1r) (d); to amend 71.06 (1q) (intro.), 71.06 (1r) (title), 71.06 (2) (i) (intro.), 71.06 (2) (j) (intro.), 71.06 (2e) (a), 71.06 (2e) (b), 71.06 (2m), 71.06 (2s) (d), 71.125 (1), 71.125 (2), 71.17 (6), 71.64 (9) (b) (intro.), 71.67 (5) (a), 71.67 (5m), 73.03 (71) (c) 2. and 73.03 (71) (d) 2.; and to create 71.06 (1r), 71.06 (2) (k), 71.06 (2) (km), 71.06 (2) (L), 71.06 (2) (Lm), 71.06 (2) (m), 71.06 (2) (mm), 71.06 (2) (n), 71.06 (2e) (be), 71.06 (2e) (bm), 71.06 (2e) (bs), 71.06 (2s) (e), 71.06 (2s) (f) and 71.06 (2s) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a flat individual income tax rate. (FE)
Title
Establishing a flat individual income tax rate. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |