WI SB106 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (b) 32. (intro.), 71.05 (6) (b) 32. a., 71.05 (6) (b) 33. (intro.) and 71.05 (6) (b) 33. a. of the statutes; relating to: allowing an individual income tax deduction for certain amounts contributed by a divorced or legally separated parent to his or her child's college savings account or college tuition and expenses program and limiting the deduction that may be claimed by a married person who files separately.
Title
Allowing an individual income tax deduction for certain amounts contributed by a divorced or legally separated parent to his or her child's college savings account or college tuition and expenses program and limiting the deduction that may be claimed by a married person who files separately.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-05-11 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-05-11 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-05-11 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-05-11 | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions | |
2009-05-06 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb106 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB106.pdf |