WI SB1075 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0401 (1m) (intro.); and to create 66.0401 (1r), 66.0401 (4) (h), 196.49 (4m) and 196.491 (3) (d) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: requiring local approval for certain wind and solar projects before Public Service Commission approval.
Title
Requiring local approval for certain wind and solar projects before Public Service Commission approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced |