WI SB144 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1106 (1) (i), 66.1106 (7) (a) and 66.1106 (11) (a); and to create 66.1106 (2) (c) and 66.1106 (7) (e) of the statutes; relating to: authorizing sharing of tax increments by certain environmental remediation tax incremental districts.
Title
Authorizing sharing of tax increments by certain environmental remediation tax incremental districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Mason [D] | Rep. Louis Molepske [D] | Rep. Louis Molepske [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Plale [D] |
Rep. Jon Richards [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-10-28 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-13 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb144 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB144.pdf |