WI SB153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 101.65 (3); and to create 101.65 (3) (a) and (b) of the statutes; Relating to: submission of building permit applications for one-family and two-family dwellings.
Title
Submission of building permit applications for one-family and two-family dwellings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb153 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB153.pdf |