WI SB162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 342.14 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: fee for certain motor vehicle certificate of title transfers. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fee for certain motor vehicle certificate of title transfers. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 165
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateLRB correction
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on calendar 2-20-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-06-05HouseReceived from Senate
2019-06-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-05SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2019-06-05SenateRules suspended
2019-06-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-05SenateRead a second time
2019-06-05SenateEmergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-06-03SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-06-03SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-05-30SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-30SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-30SenateExecutive action taken
2019-05-21SenatePublic hearing held
2019-04-17SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-04-11SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-04-11SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback