WI SB20 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 94.02 (1); to amend 94.02 (2); and to create 94.02 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: time periods for the abatement of late blight of potatoes.
Title
Time periods for the abatement of late blight of potatoes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 45 |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-02 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Representative Ripp added as a cosponsor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |