WI SB269 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (1) (fq), 20.370 (6) (dr) and 23.22 (2) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to map, control, eradicate, monitor, and minimize the spread of wild parsnip; funding for the Bureau of Natural Heritage Conservation; granting rule-making authority; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to map, control, eradicate, monitor, and minimize the spread of wild parsnip; funding for the Bureau of Natural Heritage Conservation; granting rule-making authority; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Senator Roys added as a coauthor |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-10-05 | Senate | Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Representative Behnke added as a cosponsor |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Representatives Subeck and Clancy added as cosponsors |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |