WI SB291 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.09 (1); and to create 125.02 (4m), 125.10 (5), 340.01 (8m), 346.94 (23), 346.95 (12) and 349.18 (1) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the possession and consumption of alcohol beverages on, and operation of, commercial quadricycles and providing a penalty.
Title
The possession and consumption of alcohol beverages on, and operation of, commercial quadricycles and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Jeff Stone [R] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] |
Rep. Mark Honadel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb291 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB291.pdf |