WI SB296 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-16 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-16 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.828 of the statutes; Relating to: transaction information for management of enforcement system.
Title
Transaction information for management of enforcement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-16 | Senate | Published 12-14-2013 |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 110 |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-12-2013 |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary |
2013-10-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Introduced |