WI SB298 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Published 4-16-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Published 4-16-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 29.193 (1m) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: trolling permits issued to persons whose sight is impaired. (FE)
Title
Trolling permits issued to persons whose sight is impaired. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Rep. David Steffen [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Eric Genrich [D] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 363 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |