WI SB314 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Published 5-27-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Published 5-27-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.69 (4) (intro.), 60.61 (2) (b), 62.23 (7) (b) and 66.1027 (3) (a); and to create 66.1027 (3) (c) and 560.9802 (2) (h) of the statutes; relating to: traditional neighborhood development ordinances, mixed-use zoning, and the state housing strategy plan.
Title
Traditional neighborhood development ordinances, mixed-use zoning, and the state housing strategy plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Published 5-27-2010 | |
2010-05-14 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-13-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 351 | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to the Governor on 5-11-2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-27-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:30 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-07 | Report passage recommended by committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-23 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail | |
2009-09-30 | Introduced |