WI SB314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 62.23 (7) (em) 1.; and to create 62.23 (7) (em) 2e. of the statutes; Relating to: limiting certain 2nd class cities' ability to designate or regulate historic landmarks. (FE)
Title
Limiting certain 2nd class cities' ability to designate or regulate historic landmarks. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb314 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB314.pdf |