WI SB347 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.024 (6) (am), 29.237 (1) (b), 29.301 (3), 29.347 (1), 29.347 (3) (b), 29.361 (2), 29.561, 29.563 (14) (bn), 29.563 (14) (c) 5., 29.961 (1) (a), 29.964 (1), 350.12 (3h) (ar) 1. and 350.12 (3j) (br); to renumber 23.58 and 29.237 (1) (a) 1. to 5.; to renumber and amend 23.33 (1) (o), 23.33 (2) (ir) 1., 23.33 (2j) (a), 29.506 (1), 29.961 (1) (intro.), 29.961 (2), 29.964 (intro.), 29.964 (3), 30.52 (1m) (ag) 1., 350.01 (22), 350.12 (3) (d), 350.12 (3h) (ar) 2., 350.12 (3j) (a) 1. and 350.12 (3j) (a) 2.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 29.237 (1) (intro.) and (a) (intro.); to amend 20.370 (9) (hv), 20.370 (9) (hw), 23.33 (1) (jn), 23.33 (1m) (a) 2., 23.33 (2) (a), 23.33 (2) (dm) 3., 23.33 (2) (dm) 4., 23.33 (2) (i) (intro.), 23.33 (2) (i) 1., 23.33 (2) (i) 3., 23.33 (2) (ig) 1. (intro.), 23.33 (2) (ig) 1. a., 23.33 (2) (ig) 1. b., 23.33 (2) (ig) 2., 23.33 (2) (ir) (title), 23.33 (2j) (b), 23.33 (2j) (e), 23.33 (2j) (f), 23.33 (5) (b) 2., 23.45 (1) (c), 23.45 (1) (d), 23.59, 29.001 (12), 29.024 (1), 29.024 (6) (ag), 29.024 (6) (b), 29.024 (6) (d), 29.024 (7), 29.171 (3) (a), 29.171 (3) (b), 29.172 (3), 29.173 (3), 29.179 (3) (a), 29.184 (8) (a), 29.184 (8) (b), 29.185 (4) (b), 29.185 (7) (a), 29.192 (2) (a), 29.211 (3), 29.216 (3), 29.217 (3), 29.2285 (3) (b), 29.2285 (3) (c), 29.231 (4), 29.235 (4), 29.236 (2), 29.237 (2), 29.237 (3), 29.237 (4), 29.324 (3), 29.347 (2), 29.347 (2m) (a), 29.347 (3) (a), 29.501 (6), 29.506 (5) (a), 29.506 (5) (b), 29.506 (6), 29.506 (7) (b), 29.506 (7m) (d), 29.559 (1) (a), 29.563 (1), 29.563 (11) (intro.), 29.563 (12) (a) 2., 29.563 (14) (intro.), 29.563 (14) (c) 1., 29.569 (5), 29.624 (1), 29.957, 29.961 (1) (c), 29.967 (1) (intro.), 29.971 (2) (a), 29.971 (4), 29.971 (9), 29.971 (9m), 29.971 (11g) (a), 29.971 (11g) (b), 29.971 (11m) (a), 29.971 (12), 30.50 (3), 30.50 (3b), 30.52 (1m) (a) (intro.), 30.52 (1m) (a) 1., 30.52 (1m) (a) 3., 30.52 (1m) (ag) 2., 30.52 (1m) (ar), 30.52 (5) (a) 1., 30.52 (5) (a) 2., 30.52 (5) (a) 3., 30.52 (5) (a) 4., 30.52 (5) (b) 1., 30.52 (5) (b) 2., 30.52 (5) (b) 3., 30.577 (title), 30.577 (1), 30.577 (3), 30.577 (4), 30.74 (1) (a), 30.80 (1), 30.80 (3m), 350.01 (10t), 350.05 (2) (b), 350.12 (3) (a) 1., 350.12 (3) (a) 3., 350.12 (3) (c) 2., 350.12 (3) (c) 3., 350.12 (3) (cm), 350.12 (3) (e), 350.12 (3h) (a) (intro.), 350.12 (3h) (a) 1., 350.12 (3h) (a) 3., 350.12 (3h) (ag) 1. (intro.), 350.12 (3h) (ag) 1. a., 350.12 (3h) (ag) 1. b., 350.12 (3h) (ag) 2., 350.12 (3j) (bg) 3., 350.12 (3j) (bg) 4., 350.12 (3j) (d), 350.12 (3j) (e) 1., 350.12 (3j) (e) 2., 350.12 (3j) (e) 3., 350.12 (5) (b), 350.12 (5) (c), 350.12 (5) (d), 350.12 (5) (e) and 971.19 (10); to repeal and recreate 29.964 (title); and to create 23.33 (1) (jc), 23.33 (2) (dg), 23.33 (2) (im), 23.33 (2h), 23.33 (2j) (a) 2., 23.33 (5) (b) 3., 23.47, 23.58 (2), 23.90 (6), 29.001 (65), 29.506 (1) (am), 29.555, 29.559 (1) (bm), 29.563 (11) (c), 29.563 (14) (c) 8., 29.563 (14) (d), 29.569 (3) (bm) 3., 29.961 (2) (b), 29.964 (1m) (title), 29.964 (2m), 29.964 (3m), 30.50 (9f), 30.50 (13d), 30.52 (1m) (ag) 1. a., 30.523 (1) (c), 30.678 (2m), 350.01 (10b), 350.05 (2) (c), 350.12 (3) (d) 2., 350.12 (3i), 350.12 (3j) (a) 1. b. and 350.12 (3j) (a) 2. b. of the statutes; Relating to: carcass tags issued under fish and game laws; registration of carcasses of wild animals; methods of storing, retrieving, printing, and displaying fish and game approvals; counterfeiting or illegal alteration of fish and game approvals; forgery in applying for fish and game approvals or for registration of an all-terrain vehicle, utility terrain vehicle, or snowmobile; transfers of wolf harvesting licenses; the place of trial for a violation of certain fish and game laws; methods of issuing, retrieving, reprinting, duplicating, and exhibiting registration documents and safety certificates and proving registration for all-terrain vehicles, utility terrain vehicles, and snowmobiles; methods of issuing, retrieving, reprinting, duplicating, and exhibiting certification and registration documents for boats; methods of issuing, retrieving, reprinting, and exhibiting proof of a trail pass for all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles and of a trail use sticker for snowmobiles; suspension and revocation of a certificate of number or registration for a boat; reasonable suspicion for a law enforcement officer to stop an all-terrain vehicle, utility terrain vehicle, boat, or snowmobile; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Carcass tags issued under fish and game laws; registration of carcasses of wild animals; methods of storing, retrieving, printing, and displaying fish and game approvals; counterfeiting or illegal alteration of fish and game approvals; forgery in applying for fish and game approvals or for registration of an all-terrain vehicle, utility terrain vehicle, or snowmobile; transfers of wolf harvesting licenses; the place of trial for a violation of certain fish and game laws; methods of issuing, retrieving, reprinting, duplicating, and exhibiting registration documents and safety certificates and proving registration for all-terrain vehicles, utility terrain vehicles, and snowmobiles; methods of issuing, retrieving, reprinting, duplicating, and exhibiting certification and registration documents for boats; methods of issuing, retrieving, reprinting, and exhibiting proof of a trail pass for all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles and of a trail use sticker for snowmobiles; suspension and revocation of a certificate of number or registration for a boat; reasonable suspicion for a law enforcement officer to stop an all-terrain vehicle, utility terrain vehicle, boat, or snowmobile; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb347 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB347.pdf |