WI SB375 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 767.511 (1j); and to create 767.511 (1p) of the statutes; Relating to: child support in the case of a parent convicted of sexual assault that results in conception of a child.
Title
Child support in the case of a parent convicted of sexual assault that results in conception of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk |
2023-08-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families |
2023-08-09 | Senate | Introduced |