WI SB38 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Published 7-10-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 450.03 (1) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: dispensing, distributing, or selling dialysate, drugs, or devices necessary for providing home peritoneal kidney dialysis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dispensing, distributing, or selling dialysate, drugs, or devices necessary for providing home peritoneal kidney dialysis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenatePublished 7-10-2019
2019-07-10SenateReport approved by the Governor on 7-9-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 13
2019-07-09SenatePresented to the Governor on 7-9-2019
2019-06-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2019-06-18HouseRules suspended
2019-06-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-18HouseRead a second time
2019-06-18HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-13HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-05-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-15SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended
2019-05-15SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-05-15SenateRead a second time
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on calendar 5-15-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-07SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-07SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-07SenateExecutive action taken
2019-03-15SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing held
2019-02-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2019-02-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback