WI SB387 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.62 (3) (a); and to create 30.62 (3) (ag) and 30.62 (3) (c) of the statutes; relating to: requiring that personal flotation devices be worn by certain underage persons in certain boats.
Title
Requiring that personal flotation devices be worn by certain underage persons in certain boats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Representative Clark added as a cosponsor |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Representative Bernard Schaber added as a cosponsor |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb387 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB387.pdf |