WI SB393 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 71.49 (1) (f); and to create 20.835 (2) (de), 71.07 (8m), 71.28 (8m), 71.47 (8m) and 101.129 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring universal changing stations in certain buildings, creating a tax credit for installation of the stations, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Requiring universal changing stations in certain buildings, creating a tax credit for installation of the stations, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-08-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2023-08-25 | Senate | Introduced |