WI SB402 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 449.18 (6) (am) 2.; to amend 449.01 (1) (a) 2. c. and 961.39 (intro.), (1), (2) and (4); and to create 449.18 (6) (am) 2. b. of the statutes; relating to: authorizing certain optometrists to dispense contact lenses that deliver a therapeutic pharmaceutical agent.
Title
Authorizing certain optometrists to dispense contact lenses that deliver a therapeutic pharmaceutical agent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-24 | Senator Holperin added as a coauthor | |
2009-11-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-11-18 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb402 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB402.pdf |