WI SB409 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 93.95 of the statutes; Relating to: creating an online, interactive carbon calculator for farmers. (FE)
Title
Creating an online, interactive carbon calculator for farmers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Senator Cabral-Guevara withdrawn as a coauthor |
2023-11-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |