WI SB444 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 254.23 of the statutes; Relating to: indoor air quality inspection and evaluation program for public schools. (FE)
Title
Indoor air quality inspection and evaluation program for public schools. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Nate Gustafson [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D] | Rep. Samba Baldeh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Introduced |