WI SB451 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1113 (2) (d); to amend 77.994 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 66.1113 (2) (d) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing certain municipalities to increase the rate of the premier resort area tax. (FE)
Title
Allowing certain municipalities to increase the rate of the premier resort area tax. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Alex Dallman [R] |
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] | Rep. Bob Donovan [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Paul Melotik [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 134 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-08 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2023-11-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1 |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-11-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Introduced |