WI SB461 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.08 (1) (intro.); and to create 71.07 (5n), 71.10 (4) (fm), 71.28 (5n), 71.30 (3) (dn), 71.47 (5n), 71.49 (1) (dn), 76.639 and 560.2065 of the statutes; relating to: an income and franchise tax credit for a qualified equity investment in a qualified community development entity, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
An income and franchise tax credit for a qualified equity investment in a qualified community development entity, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-20 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-19 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-17 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-17 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-17 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-16 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-11 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Coggs | |
2010-02-10 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-01 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-01 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb461 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB461.pdf |