WI SB489 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 344.32; and to amend 343.39 (1) (a), 344.18 (1m) (a), 344.18 (3m) (a), 344.26 (1), 344.27 (2), 344.30 (1), 344.33 (1), 344.34, 344.42 and 631.37 (4) (e) of the statutes; relating to: the requirement that a nonresident provide proof of financial responsibility for the operation of a motor vehicle to reinstate a suspended operating privilege or vehicle registration (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Transportation).
Title
The requirement that a nonresident provide proof of financial responsibility for the operation of a motor vehicle to reinstate a suspended operating privilege or vehicle registration (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Transportation).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Published 5-19-2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-5-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 245 | |
2010-05-04 | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-4-2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 11:54 A.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-09 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-26 | Received from Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-25 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-25 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-25 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-25 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on calendar 2-25-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-02-17 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-17 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-11 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced |