WI SB489 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.60 (3), 440.60 (9), 440.63 (1) (a) 1., 440.63 (1) (a) 2. and 454.01 (5) (b); to renumber 454.01 (5) (c) and (d); to renumber and amend 440.08 (2) (a) 20., 440.60 (4), 440.60 (5), 440.60 (10), 440.62 (3) (a), 440.62 (5) (b), 440.63 (1) (a) (intro.), 454.01 (6) and 454.01 (12); to consolidate, renumber and amend 454.01 (5) (intro.) and (a); to amend 15.405 (17), 106.52 (1) (e) 1., 440.03 (13) (b) 13., 440.03 (13) (b) 14., 440.03 (13) (b) 15., 440.08 (2) (a) 16., 440.08 (2) (a) 17., 440.08 (2) (a) 18., 440.08 (2) (a) 19., 440.60 (14), 440.62 (1) (a), 440.62 (1) (c), 440.63 (1) (b), (c) and (d), 440.63 (3) (a) (intro.), 2. and 4., 440.635, 440.64 (1) (a), chapter 454 (title), 454.01 (intro.), 454.01 (10), 454.01 (11), 454.01 (15), 454.02 (1), 454.02 (2) (intro.), 454.02 (3) (intro.), 454.04 (1) (a), 454.04 (1) (b), 454.04 (1) (c), 454.04 (1) (d), 454.04 (2) (a), 454.04 (2) (b), 454.04 (2) (c), 454.04 (2) (d), 454.06 (2) (intro.), (b) and (c), 454.06 (3) (intro.), (a), (b) and (d), 454.06 (4) (b) 1. and 2., 454.06 (5) (b) 1. and 2., 454.06 (6) (b) 1. and 2., 454.06 (7), 454.06 (10) (a), 454.07 (1), 454.08 (1) (a), 454.08 (1) (b), 454.08 (2) (a), 454.08 (2) (b), 454.08 (2) (c), 454.08 (2) (d), 454.08 (5), 454.08 (6), 454.10 (2), 454.10 (3) (a), 454.12 (intro.), 454.13 (1) (intro.), 454.13 (2), 454.15 (1), 454.15 (2) (intro.), 454.15 (2) (a), 454.15 (2) (c), 454.15 (2) (d), 454.15 (2) (i) and 454.16; and to create 15.405 (18), 440.03 (13) (b) 19e., 440.03 (13) (b) 19m., 440.03 (13) (b) 19s., 440.08 (2) (a) 24b., 440.08 (2) (a) 24d., 440.08 (2) (a) 24g., 440.08 (2) (a) 24i., 440.08 (2) (a) 24k., 440.60 (5e), 440.60 (5m), 440.60 (5s), 440.62 (1) (cm), 440.62 (3) (ag), 440.62 (3) (ar) 4m., 440.62 (5) (b) 2., 440.63 (1) (am), 440.63 (3) (am), subchapter I (title) [precedes 454.01], 454.01 (7m) (intro.), (a) and (b), 454.01 (11m), 454.01 (15m), 454.06 (8m), 454.15 (2) (j) and subchapter II of chapter 454 [precedes 454.20] of the statutes; relating to: separation of the licensing requirements for barbering and cosmetology, creation of the barbering examining board, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Separation of the licensing requirements for barbering and cosmetology, creation of the barbering examining board, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Senate | Published 4-16-2012 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 190 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-23 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:22 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 4 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 4, Noes 1 by committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs and rereferred to committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |