WI SB489 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.9865 of the statutes; Relating to: rights reserved to a parent or guardian of a child.
Title
Rights reserved to a parent or guardian of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Introduced |