WI SB516 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 14.83, 601.415 (11), 601.59, 611.33 (2) (b) 1., 611.33 (2) (b) 2. and 646.03 (2n); to renumber 646.31 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 615.10 (5); to amend 149.13 (1), 609.91 (1) (intro.), 609.91 (2), (3) and (4) (a), (b), (cm) and (d), 612.22 (3) (a), (4) and (6), 614.29 (1), 614.42 (1) (a), 615.03 (5), 628.10 (5) (a), 632.32 (2) (at), 632.32 (2) (e) (intro.), 632.32 (2) (e) 2., 632.32 (2) (e) 3., 632.32 (2) (g) (intro.), 632.32 (2) (g) 1., 632.32 (4) (a) (intro.), 632.32 (4r) (a), 632.32 (4r) (c), 645.69 (1), 646.13 (2) (d), 646.13 (4), 646.31 (4) (a), 646.31 (12), 646.32 (1), 646.32 (2), 646.325 (1), 646.325 (2) (a) 1., 646.51 (3) (c), 646.51 (5) and 646.51 (6); and to create 49.45 (31) (e), 601.31 (1) (Lg), 609.91 (1p), 615.10 (5) (intro.), 615.10 (5) (b), 615.10 (5) (c), 615.10 (5) (d), 632.32 (2) (ag), 632.32 (2) (be), 632.32 (4) (d), 632.897 (11), 646.01 (1) (b) 19., 646.31 (1) (b) 2. and 646.325 (4) of the statutes; relating to: the Interstate Insurance Receivership Compact, investment guidelines for charitable gift annuity segregated accounts, Health Insurance Risk-Sharing Plan assessment participation, reciprocity for long-term care insurance policies, voting by fraternal members, the insurance security fund, modifications to motor vehicle insurance policy and umbrella and excess liability policy requirements, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
The Interstate Insurance Receivership Compact, investment guidelines for charitable gift annuity segregated accounts, Health Insurance Risk-Sharing Plan assessment participation, reciprocity for long-term care insurance policies, voting by fraternal members, the insurance security fund, modifications to motor vehicle insurance policy and umbrella and excess liability policy requirements, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-21 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-23 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-19 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-19 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-19 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-03-19 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-03-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb516 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB516.pdf |